Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1522 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/26/2017

                            S.B. No. 1522


 AN ACT
 relating to the composition of the aviation advisory committee.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 21.003(a) and (b), Transportation Code,
 are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The aviation advisory committee consists of [six]
 members appointed by the commission to advise the commission and
 the department on aviation matters.  The commission by rule shall
 determine the number of members of the committee.
 (b)  A majority of the members of the committee [member] must
 have five years of successful experience as:
 (1)  an aircraft pilot;
 (2)  an aircraft facilities manager; or
 (3)  a fixed-base operator.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than September 1, 2018, the Texas
 Transportation Commission shall adopt the rules required by Section
 21.003(a), Transportation Code, as amended by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1522 passed the Senate on
 April 19, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1522 passed the House on
 May 24, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 146, Nays 0, two
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor