6 | 8 | | needs and availability in this state. |
---|
7 | 9 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 10 | | SECTION 1. (a) In this section, "board" means the Texas |
---|
9 | 11 | | Water Development Board. |
---|
10 | 12 | | (b) The board shall: |
---|
11 | 13 | | (1) conduct a study of water needs and availability in |
---|
12 | 14 | | this state; and |
---|
13 | 15 | | (2) use the results of the study to produce a |
---|
14 | 16 | | comprehensive water resources map. |
---|
15 | 17 | | (c) The study must consider: |
---|
16 | 18 | | (1) opportunities for, obstacles to, and costs |
---|
17 | 19 | | associated with the development of new sources of water, including |
---|
18 | 20 | | but not limited to the diversion of water from contiguous states, |
---|
19 | 21 | | the use of flood control diversion channels, and the reuse of water |
---|
20 | 22 | | associated with oil and gas operations; |
---|
21 | 23 | | (2) potential locations of facilities for the |
---|
22 | 24 | | desalination of marine seawater and brackish groundwater; |
---|
23 | 25 | | (3) the allocation of costs associated with the |
---|
24 | 26 | | transportation of desalinated marine seawater and brackish |
---|
25 | 27 | | groundwater from the place of production to end users; |
---|
26 | 28 | | (4) the potential for the use of public-private |
---|
27 | 29 | | partnerships for water development projects in this state; and |
---|
28 | 30 | | (5) methods to ensure that stakeholders from all water |
---|
29 | 31 | | user groups are included in the development of plans for the use of |
---|
30 | 32 | | water in this state. |
---|
31 | 33 | | (d) In conducting the study, the board may consult with the |
---|
32 | 34 | | Texas Commission on Environmental Quality. |
---|
33 | 35 | | (e) Not later than December 1, 2018, the board shall submit |
---|
34 | 36 | | to each standing committee of the legislature having primary |
---|
35 | 37 | | jurisdiction over water development: |
---|
36 | 38 | | (1) a report of the findings of the study conducted |
---|
37 | 39 | | under this section; and |
---|
38 | 40 | | (2) the map developed by the board under Subsection |
---|
39 | 41 | | (b) of this section. |
---|
40 | | - | SECTION 2. Section 11.155, Water Code, is amended to read as |
---|
41 | | - | follows: |
---|
42 | | - | Sec. 11.155. AQUIFER STORAGE AND RECOVERY REPORTS. |
---|
43 | | - | (a) The board shall make studies, investigations, and surveys of |
---|
44 | | - | the aquifers in the state as it considers necessary to determine the |
---|
45 | | - | occurrence, quantity, quality, and availability of aquifers in |
---|
46 | | - | which water may be stored and subsequently retrieved for beneficial |
---|
47 | | - | use. |
---|
48 | | - | (b) The board, working with appropriate interested persons, |
---|
49 | | - | including groundwater conservation districts, regional water |
---|
50 | | - | planning groups, and potential sponsors of aquifer storage and |
---|
51 | | - | recovery projects, shall: |
---|
52 | | - | (1) conduct studies of aquifer storage and recovery |
---|
53 | | - | projects identified in the state water plan or by interested |
---|
54 | | - | persons; and |
---|
55 | | - | (2) report the results of each study conducted under |
---|
56 | | - | Subdivision (1) to regional water planning groups and interested |
---|
57 | | - | persons. |
---|
58 | | - | (c) This subsection expires January 1, 2019. The board |
---|
59 | | - | shall: |
---|
60 | | - | (1) conduct a statewide survey of the most favorable |
---|
61 | | - | areas for aquifer storage and recovery; |
---|
62 | | - | (2) prepare a report that includes an overview of the |
---|
63 | | - | survey conducted under Subdivision (1); and |
---|
64 | | - | (3) not later than December 15, 2018, submit the |
---|
65 | | - | report described by Subdivision (2) to the governor, lieutenant |
---|
66 | | - | governor, and speaker of the house of representatives. [The board |
---|
67 | | - | shall undertake the studies, investigations, and surveys in the |
---|
68 | | - | following order of priority: |
---|
69 | | - | [(1) areas designated by the commission as "priority |
---|
70 | | - | groundwater management areas" under Section 35.008; and |
---|
71 | | - | [(2) other areas of the state in a priority to be |
---|
72 | | - | determined by the board's ranking of where the greatest need |
---|
73 | | - | exists.] |
---|
74 | | - | SECTION 3. The Texas Water Development Board is required to |
---|
75 | | - | implement Sections 11.155(b) and (c), Water Code, as added by this |
---|
76 | | - | Act, only if the legislature appropriates money specifically for |
---|
77 | | - | that purpose. If the legislature does not appropriate money |
---|
78 | | - | specifically for that purpose, the board may, but is not required |
---|
79 | | - | to, implement Sections 11.155(b) and (c), Water Code, as added by |
---|
80 | | - | this Act, using other appropriations available for the purpose. |
---|
81 | | - | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017. |
---|
82 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
83 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
84 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1525 passed the Senate on |
---|
85 | | - | April 19, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that |
---|
86 | | - | the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 27, 2017, by the |
---|
87 | | - | following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
88 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
89 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
90 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1525 passed the House, with |
---|
91 | | - | amendment, on May 24, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 144, |
---|
92 | | - | Nays 2, one present not voting. |
---|
93 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
94 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
95 | | - | Approved: |
---|
96 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
97 | | - | Date |
---|
98 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
99 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 42 | + | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017. |
---|