Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1525 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/27/2017

                            S.B. No. 1525


 AN ACT
 relating to studies by the Texas Water Development Board of water
 needs and availability in this state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a)  In this section, "board" means the Texas
 Water Development Board.
 (b)  The board shall:
 (1)  conduct a study of water needs and availability in
 this state; and
 (2)  use the results of the study to produce a
 comprehensive water resources map.
 (c)  The study must consider:
 (1)  opportunities for, obstacles to, and costs
 associated with the development of new sources of water, including
 but not limited to the diversion of water from contiguous states,
 the use of flood control diversion channels, and the reuse of water
 associated with oil and gas operations;
 (2)  potential locations of facilities for the
 desalination of marine seawater and brackish groundwater;
 (3)  the allocation of costs associated with the
 transportation of desalinated marine seawater and brackish
 groundwater from the place of production to end users;
 (4)  the potential for the use of public-private
 partnerships for water development projects in this state; and
 (5)  methods to ensure that stakeholders from all water
 user groups are included in the development of plans for the use of
 water in this state.
 (d)  In conducting the study, the board may consult with the
 Texas Commission on Environmental Quality.
 (e)  Not later than December 1, 2018, the board shall submit
 to each standing committee of the legislature having primary
 jurisdiction over water development:
 (1)  a report of the findings of the study conducted
 under this section; and
 (2)  the map developed by the board under Subsection
 (b) of this section.
 SECTION 2.  Section 11.155, Water Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 11.155.  AQUIFER STORAGE AND RECOVERY REPORTS.
 (a)  The board shall make studies, investigations, and surveys of
 the aquifers in the state as it considers necessary to determine the
 occurrence, quantity, quality, and availability of aquifers in
 which water may be stored and subsequently retrieved for beneficial
 use.
 (b)  The board, working with appropriate interested persons,
 including groundwater conservation districts, regional water
 planning groups, and potential sponsors of aquifer storage and
 recovery projects, shall:
 (1)  conduct studies of aquifer storage and recovery
 projects identified in the state water plan or by interested
 persons; and
 (2)  report the results of each study conducted under
 Subdivision (1) to regional water planning groups and interested
 persons.
 (c)  This subsection expires January 1, 2019. The board
 shall:
 (1)  conduct a statewide survey of the most favorable
 areas for aquifer storage and recovery;
 (2)  prepare a report that includes an overview of the
 survey conducted under Subdivision (1); and
 (3)  not later than December 15, 2018, submit the
 report described by Subdivision (2) to the governor, lieutenant
 governor, and speaker of the house of representatives.  [The board
 shall undertake the studies, investigations, and surveys in the
 following order of priority:
 [(1)     areas designated by the commission as "priority
 groundwater management areas" under Section 35.008; and
 [(2)     other areas of the state in a priority to be
 determined by the board's ranking of where the greatest need
 exists.]
 SECTION 3.  The Texas Water Development Board is required to
 implement Sections 11.155(b) and (c), Water Code, as added by this
 Act, only if the legislature appropriates money specifically for
 that purpose. If the legislature does not appropriate money
 specifically for that purpose, the board may, but is not required
 to, implement Sections 11.155(b) and (c), Water Code, as added by
 this Act, using other appropriations available for the purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1525 passed the Senate on
 April 19, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 27, 2017, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1525 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 24, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 144,
 Nays 2, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor