Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1538 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 8, 2017

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2017

Enrolled

Bill May 26, 2017

Comm Sub

Bill May 16, 2017
Bill April 6, 2017