Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1557 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 8, 2017

Engrossed

Bill April 3, 2017

Enrolled

Bill May 25, 2017

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2017
Bill March 29, 2017