House | 05/18/2017 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 05/18/2017 | No action taken in committee | ||
House | 05/05/2017 | Referred to Transportation | ||
House | 05/05/2017 | Read first time | ||
House | 04/26/2017 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Passed | ||
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/08/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/08/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |