Old | New | Differences | |
---|---|---|---|
1 | 1 | By: Taylor of Collin S.B. No. 1561 | |
2 | - | Kolkhorst | |
2 | + | (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2017; March 21, 2017, read | |
3 | + | first time and referred to Committee on Education; May 9, 2017, | |
4 | + | reported favorably, as amended, by the following vote: Yeas 11, | |
5 | + | Nays 0; May 9, 2017, sent to printer.) | |
6 | + | Click here to see the committee vote | |
3 | 7 | ||
4 | 8 | ||
9 | + | COMMITTEE AMENDMENT NO. 1 By: Taylor of Collin | |
10 | + | Amend S.B. 1561 by adding the following appropriately | |
11 | + | numbered SECTION to the bill and renumbering the subsequent | |
12 | + | SECTIONS of the bill appropriately: | |
13 | + | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect only if a specific | |
14 | + | appropriation for the implementation of the Act is provided in a | |
15 | + | general appropriations act of the 85th Legislature. | |
5 | 16 | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED | |
6 | 17 | AN ACT | |
7 | 18 | relating to a study by the State Board of Education on the | |
8 | 19 | instructional day and academic year requirements necessary to | |
9 | 20 | complete the required curriculum in public schools. | |
10 | 21 | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: | |
11 | 22 | SECTION 1. (a) The State Board of Education shall conduct | |
12 | 23 | a study to determine, for kindergarten through 12th grade, the | |
13 | 24 | length of the instructional day and of the academic year that would | |
14 | 25 | be necessary to allow for the completion of the required curriculum | |
15 | 26 | identified by the board under Section 28.002, Education Code. | |
16 | 27 | (b) Not later than October 1, 2018, the board shall deliver | |
17 | 28 | a report containing the results of the study to the governor and the | |
18 | 29 | legislature. | |
19 | 30 | (c) This Act expires September 1, 2019. | |
20 | - | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect only if a specific | |
21 | - | appropriation for the implementation of the Act is provided in a | |
22 | - | general appropriations act of the 85th Legislature. | |
23 | - | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives | |
31 | + | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives | |
24 | 32 | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as | |
25 | 33 | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this | |
26 | 34 | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this | |
27 | 35 | Act takes effect September 1, 2017. | |
36 | + | * * * * * |