Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Postponed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Referred to Urban Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2017
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2017
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|