Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1656 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/02/2017

                    By: Watson S.B. No. 1656
 (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2017; March 22, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; May 2, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 5, Nays 1; May 2, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the eligibility of certain municipalities to establish
 homestead preservation districts and reinvestment zones.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 373A.003(a), Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 373A.003.  APPLICABILITY OF CHAPTER.  (a)  This chapter
 applies to a municipality with a population of more than 750,000
 that is located in a uniform state service region with fewer than
 800,000 [550,000] occupied housing units as determined by the most
 recent United States decennial census.
 (b)  Subchapters A, B, C, and D apply to any municipality
 with a population of 1.18 million or more which is located
 predominantly in a county that has a total area of less than 1,000
 square miles and has adopted an urban land bank demonstration
 program under Chapter 379C, Local Government Code.
 (c)  If this chapter applies to a municipality as provided by
 Subsection (a), the application of this chapter to the municipality
 is not affected if the municipality's population or the number of
 occupied housing units changes and the municipality no longer meets
 the population requirement of Subsection (a).
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *