By: Lucio S.B. No. 1677 (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2017; March 22, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran Affairs & Border Security; April 24, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; April 24, 2017, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1677 By: Lucio A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to information about services for women veterans provided through certain state agency applications. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter E, Chapter 434, Government Code, is amended by adding Section 434.212 to read as follows: Sec. 434.212. APPLICATION FOR STATE AGENCY PROGRAMS, SERVICES, OR ASSISTANCE. (a) This section applies to a state agency in the executive branch of state government, including a health and human services agency, that provides to adult women in this state a program, a service, or assistance, including the Temporary Assistance for Needy Families program, the supplemental nutrition assistance program, the women's health program, Medicaid, the Special Supplemental Nutrition Program for Women, Infants, and Children, and a housing program or service or housing assistance. (b) A state agency shall include in each application for a program, a service, or assistance provided by the agency to adult women: (1) a space to indicate whether the applicant is a veteran; and (2) model language informing the applicant that she may be entitled to additional services because of her veteran status. (c) The commission shall develop the model language required on an application under Subsection (b)(2). The language must include a link to the veterans website established under Section 434.102 or, for an online application, a hyperlink to that website. SECTION 2. (a) Not later than December 1, 2017, the Texas Veterans Commission shall develop the model application language required by Section 434.212, Government Code, as added by this Act, and post that information on the commission's Internet website. (b) Not later than March 1, 2018, each state agency subject to Section 434.212, Government Code, as added by this Act, shall modify the agency's application for programs, services, or assistance as necessary to implement that section. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017. * * * * *