Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1677 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/23/2017

                            S.B. No. 1677


 AN ACT
 relating to information about services for women veterans provided
 through certain state agency applications.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter E, Chapter 434, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 434.212 to read as follows:
 Sec. 434.212.  APPLICATION FOR STATE AGENCY PROGRAMS,
 SERVICES, OR ASSISTANCE. (a)  This section applies to a state
 agency in the executive branch of state government, including a
 health and human services agency, that provides to adult women in
 this state a program, a service, or assistance, including the
 Temporary Assistance for Needy Families program, the supplemental
 nutrition assistance program, the women's health program,
 Medicaid, the Special Supplemental Nutrition Program for Women,
 Infants, and Children, and a housing program or service or housing
 assistance.
 (b)  A state agency shall include in each application for a
 program, a service, or assistance provided by the agency to adult
 women:
 (1)  a space to indicate whether the applicant is a
 veteran; and
 (2)  model language informing the applicant that she
 may be entitled to additional services because of her veteran
 status.
 (c)  The commission shall develop the model language
 required on an application under Subsection (b)(2). The language
 must include a link to the veterans website established under
 Section 434.102 or, for an online application, a hyperlink to that
 website.
 SECTION 2.  (a)  Not later than December 1, 2017, the Texas
 Veterans Commission shall develop the model application language
 required by Section 434.212, Government Code, as added by this Act,
 and post that information on the commission's Internet website.
 (b)  Not later than March 1, 2018, each state agency subject
 to Section 434.212, Government Code, as added by this Act, shall
 modify the agency's application for programs, services, or
 assistance as necessary to implement that section.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1677 passed the Senate on
 May 1, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 29, Nays 2.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1677 passed the House on
 May 23, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 134, Nays 12, three
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor