4 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 7 | | relating to information about services for women veterans provided |
---|
6 | 8 | | through certain state agency applications. |
---|
7 | 9 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 10 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter E, Chapter 434, Government Code, is |
---|
9 | 11 | | amended by adding Section 434.212 to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 12 | | Sec. 434.212. APPLICATION FOR STATE AGENCY PROGRAMS, |
---|
11 | 13 | | SERVICES, OR ASSISTANCE. (a) This section applies to a state |
---|
12 | 14 | | agency in the executive branch of state government, including a |
---|
13 | 15 | | health and human services agency, that provides to adult women in |
---|
14 | 16 | | this state a program, a service, or assistance, including the |
---|
15 | 17 | | Temporary Assistance for Needy Families program, the supplemental |
---|
16 | 18 | | nutrition assistance program, the women's health program, |
---|
17 | 19 | | Medicaid, the Special Supplemental Nutrition Program for Women, |
---|
18 | 20 | | Infants, and Children, and a housing program or service or housing |
---|
19 | 21 | | assistance. |
---|
20 | 22 | | (b) A state agency shall include in each application for a |
---|
21 | 23 | | program, a service, or assistance provided by the agency to adult |
---|
22 | 24 | | women: |
---|
23 | 25 | | (1) a space to indicate whether the applicant is a |
---|
24 | 26 | | veteran; and |
---|
25 | 27 | | (2) model language informing the applicant that she |
---|
26 | 28 | | may be entitled to additional services because of her veteran |
---|
27 | 29 | | status. |
---|
28 | 30 | | (c) The commission shall develop the model language |
---|
29 | 31 | | required on an application under Subsection (b)(2). The language |
---|
30 | 32 | | must include a link to the veterans website established under |
---|
31 | 33 | | Section 434.102 or, for an online application, a hyperlink to that |
---|
32 | 34 | | website. |
---|
33 | 35 | | SECTION 2. (a) Not later than December 1, 2017, the Texas |
---|
34 | 36 | | Veterans Commission shall develop the model application language |
---|
35 | 37 | | required by Section 434.212, Government Code, as added by this Act, |
---|
36 | 38 | | and post that information on the commission's Internet website. |
---|
37 | 39 | | (b) Not later than March 1, 2018, each state agency subject |
---|
38 | 40 | | to Section 434.212, Government Code, as added by this Act, shall |
---|
39 | 41 | | modify the agency's application for programs, services, or |
---|
40 | 42 | | assistance as necessary to implement that section. |
---|
41 | 43 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017. |
---|
42 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
43 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
44 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1677 passed the Senate on |
---|
45 | | - | May 1, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 2. |
---|
46 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
47 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
48 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1677 passed the House on |
---|
49 | | - | May 23, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 134, Nays 12, three |
---|
50 | | - | present not voting. |
---|
51 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
52 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
53 | | - | Approved: |
---|
54 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
55 | | - | Date |
---|
56 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
57 | | - | Governor |
---|