Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1737 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/03/2017

                            By: Miles S.B. No. 1737
 (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2017; March 23, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; May 3, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0;
 May 3, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1737 By:  Garcia


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the enforcement of conciliation agreements entered into
 under the Texas Fair Housing Act.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter G, Chapter 301, Property Code, is
 amended by adding Section 301.134 to read as follows:
 Sec. 301.134.  CONCILIATION AGREEMENT ENFORCEMENT. The
 commission may monitor a respondent's compliance with a
 conciliation agreement entered into under this chapter. If the
 commission has reasonable cause to believe that a respondent has
 breached a conciliation agreement, the commission shall refer the
 matter to the attorney general with a recommendation for the
 attorney general to file in accordance with this subchapter a civil
 action to enforce the agreement.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *