Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1785 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/03/2017

                            By: Uresti S.B. No. 1785
 (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2017; March 23, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Education; May 3, 2017,
 reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 3;
 May 3, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to appraisal of public school teachers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 21.351, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (e) to read as follows:
 (e)  Under the recommended appraisal process, a student
 evaluation may not be used as a criterion on which to appraise the
 performance of a teacher.
 SECTION 2.  Section 21.352, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (g) to read as follows:
 (g)  Under the appraisal process developed under this
 section, a student evaluation may not be used as a criterion on
 which to appraise the performance of a teacher.
 SECTION 3.  This Act applies beginning with the 2017-2018
 school year.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *