E
|
06/09/2017
|
Effective on 9/1/17
|
|
|
E
|
06/09/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4244
|
E
|
05/28/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4213
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6033
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4150
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6033
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4213
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3787
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3787
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 4075
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5587
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5586
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3498
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2244
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2244
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3884
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3884
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3744
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3744
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3744
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 2065
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2064
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 2064
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2064
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2056
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1921
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3437
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1247
|
Journal Page: 3437
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3437
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3434
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3352
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1192
|
Journal Page: 3351
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3351
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Amended
|
2-Minjarez
|
Journal Page: 3351
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3350
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 306
|
Journal Page: 3350
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3238
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 2754
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2754
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2506
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1688
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1594
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1594
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1594
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1594
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1594
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1594
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1594
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA6 Birdwell
|
Journal Page: 1593
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1591
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1591
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1623
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1318
|
Senate
|
04/25/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1287
|
Senate
|
04/25/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1285
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 745
|
Senate
|
03/27/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 713
|
Senate
|
03/06/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 414
|
Senate
|
01/25/2017
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 114
|
Senate
|
01/25/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 114
|
Senate
|
11/14/2016
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2016
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|