LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2017 - 85th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB179
Compare Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB179
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB179
Compare Versions
SB179 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB179 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB179 Enrolled May 27, 2017
SB179 Comm Sub May 9, 2017
SB179 Engrossed May 3, 2017
SB179 Comm Sub April 25, 2017
SB179 Introduced November 15, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SB179 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB179 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB179 Enrolled May 27, 2017
SB179 Comm Sub May 9, 2017
SB179 Engrossed May 3, 2017
SB179 Comm Sub April 25, 2017
SB179 Introduced November 15, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare