Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1830 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 04/20/2017

                            By: Rodríguez S.B. No. 1830
 (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2017; March 23, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 April 20, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 20, 2017,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1830 By:  Rodríguez


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use of connected braking systems to maintain
 distance between vehicles.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 545.062, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  An operator of a vehicle equipped with a connected
 braking system that is following another vehicle equipped with that
 system may be assisted by the system to maintain an assured clear
 distance or sufficient space as required by this section.  In this
 subsection, "connected braking system" means a system by which the
 braking of one vehicle is electronically coordinated with the
 braking system of a following vehicle.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *