4 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 7 | | relating to an annual report on state programs not funded by |
---|
6 | 8 | | appropriations. |
---|
7 | 9 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 10 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 403, Government Code, is |
---|
9 | 11 | | amended by adding Section 403.0147 to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 12 | | Sec. 403.0147. REPORT ON STATE PROGRAMS NOT FUNDED BY |
---|
11 | 13 | | APPROPRIATIONS. (a) In this section, "state agency" means an |
---|
12 | 14 | | agency, department, board, commission, or other entity in the |
---|
13 | 15 | | executive, legislative, or judicial branch of state government. |
---|
14 | 16 | | (b) Not later than December 31 of each year, the comptroller |
---|
15 | 17 | | shall submit a report to the legislature that identifies for each |
---|
16 | 18 | | state agency: |
---|
17 | 19 | | (1) each program the state agency is statutorily |
---|
18 | 20 | | required to implement for which no appropriation was made for the |
---|
19 | 21 | | preceding state fiscal year, along with a citation to the law |
---|
20 | 22 | | imposing the requirement; and |
---|
21 | 23 | | (2) the amount and source of money the state agency |
---|
22 | 24 | | spent, if any, to implement any portion of the program described by |
---|
23 | 25 | | Subdivision (1) during the preceding state fiscal year. |
---|
24 | 26 | | (c) A state agency shall provide to the comptroller not |
---|
25 | 27 | | later than September 30 of each year information necessary for the |
---|
26 | 28 | | comptroller to prepare the report required by this section. The |
---|
27 | 29 | | comptroller may prescribe the form and content of the information a |
---|
28 | 30 | | state agency must provide. |
---|
29 | 31 | | SECTION 2. The comptroller of public accounts shall submit |
---|
30 | 32 | | the initial report required by Section 403.0147, Government Code, |
---|
31 | 33 | | as added by this Act, not later than December 31, 2017. |
---|
32 | 34 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
33 | 35 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
34 | 36 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
35 | 37 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
36 | 38 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2017. |
---|
37 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
38 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
39 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1831 passed the Senate on |
---|
40 | | - | May 4, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; |
---|
41 | | - | May 25, 2017, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and |
---|
42 | | - | requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 26, 2017, House |
---|
43 | | - | granted request of the Senate; May 28, 2017, Senate adopted |
---|
44 | | - | Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 29, |
---|
45 | | - | Nays 1. |
---|
46 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
47 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
48 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1831 passed the House, with |
---|
49 | | - | amendments, on May 21, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 135, |
---|
50 | | - | Nays 0, two present not voting; May 26, 2017, House granted request |
---|
51 | | - | of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee; |
---|
52 | | - | May 28, 2017, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the |
---|
53 | | - | following vote: Yeas 146, Nays 0, one present not voting. |
---|
54 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
55 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
56 | | - | Approved: |
---|
57 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
58 | | - | Date |
---|
59 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
60 | | - | Governor |
---|