Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1831 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/29/2017

                            S.B. No. 1831


 AN ACT
 relating to an annual report on state programs not funded by
 appropriations.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 403, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 403.0147 to read as follows:
 Sec. 403.0147.  REPORT ON STATE PROGRAMS NOT FUNDED BY
 APPROPRIATIONS. (a)  In this section, "state agency" means an
 agency, department, board, commission, or other entity in the
 executive, legislative, or judicial branch of state government.
 (b)  Not later than December 31 of each year, the comptroller
 shall submit a report to the legislature that identifies for each
 state agency:
 (1)  each program the state agency is statutorily
 required to implement for which no appropriation was made for the
 preceding state fiscal year, along with a citation to the law
 imposing the requirement; and
 (2)  the amount and source of money the state agency
 spent, if any, to implement any portion of the program described by
 Subdivision (1) during the preceding state fiscal year.
 (c)  A state agency shall provide to the comptroller not
 later than September 30 of each year information necessary for the
 comptroller to prepare the report required by this section.  The
 comptroller may prescribe the form and content of the information a
 state agency must provide.
 SECTION 2.  The comptroller of public accounts shall submit
 the initial report required by Section 403.0147, Government Code,
 as added by this Act, not later than December 31, 2017.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1831 passed the Senate on
 May 4, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0;
 May 25, 2017, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 26, 2017, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 28, 2017, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote:  Yeas 29,
 Nays 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1831 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 21, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 135,
 Nays 0, two present not voting; May 26, 2017, House granted request
 of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 28, 2017, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote:  Yeas 146, Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor