Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1911 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 13, 2017

Engrossed

Bill April 26, 2017

Enrolled

Bill May 26, 2017

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2017
Bill April 12, 2017