Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1911 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/26/2017

                            S.B. No. 1911


 AN ACT
 relating to the provision of certain self-help resources by state
 and county courts, including through the Internet website of a
 state court and in the office of the court clerk.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter I, Chapter 51, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 51.808 to read as follows:
 Sec. 51.808.  NOTICE OF SELF-HELP RESOURCES. (a)  The clerk
 of each court in this state shall:
 (1)  post on the court's Internet website, if any, a
 link to:
 (A)  the self-help resources Internet website
 designated by the Office of Court Administration of the Texas
 Judicial System, in consultation with the Texas Access to Justice
 Commission, that includes information on:
 (i)  lawyer referral services certified
 under Chapter 952, Occupations Code;
 (ii)  the name, location, and any Internet
 website of any local legal aid office; and
 (iii)  any court-affiliated self-help
 center serving the county in which the court is located; and
 (B)  the State Law Library's Internet website; and
 (2)  conspicuously display in the clerk's office in a
 location frequently accessed by the public a sign with the
 information described in Subdivision (1).
 (b)  The Office of Court Administration of the Texas Judicial
 System shall prescribe the format for the information required
 under Subsection (a).
 SECTION 2.  Section 323.021, Local Government Code, is
 amended by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (c) to
 read as follows:
 (a)  The commissioners court of a county by order may
 establish and maintain a county law library at the county seat or
 another location determined by the commissioners court.
 (c)  The commissioners court of a county may establish,
 maintain, and operate in cooperation with other counties a joint
 free county law library for the benefit of the cooperating counties
 in the same manner that a joint county library may be established
 and operated under Section 323.010.
 SECTION 3.  Section 323.023(b), Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The clerks of the respective courts shall collect the
 costs and pay them to the county treasurer, or to any other official
 who discharges the duties commonly delegated to the county
 treasurer, for deposit in a fund to be known as the county law
 library fund. The fund may be used only for:
 (1)  establishing the law library after the entry of
 the order creating it;
 (2)  purchasing or leasing library materials,
 maintaining the library, or acquiring furniture, shelving, or
 equipment for the library; [or]
 (3)  purchasing or leasing library materials or
 acquiring library equipment, including computers, software, and
 subscriptions to obtain access to electronic research networks for
 use by judges in the county; or
 (4)  establishing and maintaining a self-help center to
 provide resources to county residents representing themselves in
 legal matters.
 SECTION 4.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the Office of Court Administration of the Texas
 Judicial System shall prescribe the format of the information
 required under Section 51.808, Government Code, as added by this
 Act.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1911 passed the Senate on
 April 26, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 26, 2017, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1911 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 23, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 145,
 Nays 0, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor