Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1932 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/29/2017

                            S.B. No. 1932


 AN ACT
 relating to eligibility requirements for registration as an
 interior designer.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1053.155(b), Occupations Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  An application for admission to the registration
 examination must be accompanied by evidence satisfactory to the
 board that the applicant has satisfied the educational and
 professional experience requirements for the examination adopted
 by the board under Section 1053.154[:
 [(1)     has graduated from an interior design educational
 program recognized and approved by the board; and
 [(2)     has professional experience in the field of
 interior design].
 SECTION 2.  Section 1053.155(c), Occupations Code, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1932 passed the Senate on
 May 4, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1; and that the
 Senate concurred in House amendment on May 28, 2017, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1932 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 19, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 144,
 Nays 0, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor