1 | 1 | | 85R139 AJZ-D |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: Miles S.B. No. 1984 |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
6 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
7 | 7 | | relating to the creation and funding of the urban farming pilot |
---|
8 | 8 | | program and the creation of the Select Committee on Urban Farming. |
---|
9 | 9 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
10 | 10 | | SECTION 1. Title 3, Agriculture Code, is amended by adding |
---|
11 | 11 | | Chapter 50E to read as follows: |
---|
12 | 12 | | CHAPTER 50E. URBAN FARMING PILOT PROGRAM AND SELECT COMMITTEE |
---|
13 | 13 | | SUBCHAPTER A. URBAN FARMING PILOT PROGRAM |
---|
14 | 14 | | Sec. 50E.001. DEFINITION. In this chapter, "program" means |
---|
15 | 15 | | the urban farming pilot program established under this chapter. |
---|
16 | 16 | | Sec. 50E.002. ESTABLISHMENT OF URBAN FARMING PILOT PROGRAM. |
---|
17 | 17 | | (a) The department by rule shall develop and implement an urban |
---|
18 | 18 | | farming pilot program through which the department will award |
---|
19 | 19 | | grants if funding for grants is available to urban farmers in this |
---|
20 | 20 | | state to establish new urban farms and expand existing urban farms. |
---|
21 | 21 | | (b) The department by rule shall define "urban farm" and |
---|
22 | 22 | | "urban farmer" for purposes of this chapter. |
---|
23 | 23 | | (c) The department may operate the program in an area |
---|
24 | 24 | | designated as an enterprise zone under Chapter 2303, Government |
---|
25 | 25 | | Code, in a municipality with a population of 500,000 or more. |
---|
26 | 26 | | Sec. 50E.003. USE OF AWARDED GRANT MONEY. A grant recipient |
---|
27 | 27 | | may use grant money awarded under the program only to cover costs |
---|
28 | 28 | | that are approved by the department. |
---|
29 | 29 | | Sec. 50E.004. GRANT RECIPIENT REPORTING REQUIREMENTS. A |
---|
30 | 30 | | grant recipient shall report information related to the program to |
---|
31 | 31 | | the department in the form and manner and at regular intervals as |
---|
32 | 32 | | prescribed by the department. |
---|
33 | 33 | | Sec. 50E.005. EVALUATION BY DEPARTMENT. The department |
---|
34 | 34 | | shall monitor and periodically evaluate: |
---|
35 | 35 | | (1) the performance of each grant recipient under the |
---|
36 | 36 | | program; |
---|
37 | 37 | | (2) how each grant recipient uses the grant money |
---|
38 | 38 | | awarded under the program; and |
---|
39 | 39 | | (3) the effect of the program on the grant recipient |
---|
40 | 40 | | and on the residents of the municipality in which the grant |
---|
41 | 41 | | recipient uses grant money. |
---|
42 | 42 | | Sec. 50E.006. GRANTS AND DONATIONS. The department may |
---|
43 | 43 | | seek, accept, and spend any funds received through grants or |
---|
44 | 44 | | donations from public or private sources for the purposes of the |
---|
45 | 45 | | program. |
---|
46 | 46 | | SUBCHAPTER B. SELECT COMMITTEE ON URBAN FARMING |
---|
47 | 47 | | Sec. 50E.011. DEFINITION. In this chapter, "committee" |
---|
48 | 48 | | means the Select Committee on Urban Farming. |
---|
49 | 49 | | Sec. 50E.012. COMPOSITION. (a) The Select Committee on |
---|
50 | 50 | | Urban Farming is composed of: |
---|
51 | 51 | | (1) three members appointed by the president of |
---|
52 | 52 | | Prairie View A&M University; |
---|
53 | 53 | | (2) three members appointed by the board of regents of |
---|
54 | 54 | | The Texas A&M University System; and |
---|
55 | 55 | | (3) three members appointed by the director of the |
---|
56 | 56 | | Texas A&M AgriLife Extension Service. |
---|
57 | 57 | | (b) The committee shall elect a presiding officer from among |
---|
58 | 58 | | its members. |
---|
59 | 59 | | Sec. 50E.013. COMPENSATION. A person is not entitled to |
---|
60 | 60 | | compensation or reimbursement for serving as a committee member. |
---|
61 | 61 | | Sec. 50E.014. COMMITTEE DUTIES. (a) The committee shall: |
---|
62 | 62 | | (1) meet at the call of the presiding officer; and |
---|
63 | 63 | | (2) conduct an interim study and make recommendations |
---|
64 | 64 | | to the legislature regarding: |
---|
65 | 65 | | (A) the performance and operation of the program; |
---|
66 | 66 | | (B) the continuation, elimination, or expansion |
---|
67 | 67 | | of the program; |
---|
68 | 68 | | (C) urban farming trends, including farming in |
---|
69 | 69 | | sustainable living communities, cooperative crop production, and |
---|
70 | 70 | | vertical integration farming; |
---|
71 | 71 | | (D) capacity for urban farming in this state; and |
---|
72 | 72 | | (E) potential effects of urban farming on the |
---|
73 | 73 | | population of this state and on enterprise zones. |
---|
74 | 74 | | (b) The committee may request the assistance of state |
---|
75 | 75 | | agencies, departments, or offices to carry out its duties. |
---|
76 | 76 | | Sec. 50E.015. REPORT. Not later than December 1, 2018, the |
---|
77 | 77 | | committee shall submit a report based on its findings to: |
---|
78 | 78 | | (1) the governor; |
---|
79 | 79 | | (2) the lieutenant governor; and |
---|
80 | 80 | | (3) the speaker of the house of representatives. |
---|
81 | 81 | | SUBCHAPTER C. EXPIRATION OF CHAPTER |
---|
82 | 82 | | Sec. 50E.021. EXPIRATION. This chapter expires and the |
---|
83 | 83 | | committee is abolished September 1, 2019. |
---|
84 | 84 | | SECTION 2. (a) Not later than January 1, 2018, the |
---|
85 | 85 | | Department of Agriculture shall implement the urban farming pilot |
---|
86 | 86 | | program established under Chapter 50E, Agriculture Code, as added |
---|
87 | 87 | | by this Act. |
---|
88 | 88 | | (b) Not later than October 1, 2017, the appointing entities |
---|
89 | 89 | | listed in Section 50E.012, Agriculture Code, as added by this Act, |
---|
90 | 90 | | shall make the appointments required by that section. |
---|
91 | 91 | | (c) Not later than October 15, 2017, the commissioner of |
---|
92 | 92 | | agriculture shall call the first meeting of the Select Committee on |
---|
93 | 93 | | Urban Farming to permit the committee to elect a presiding officer |
---|
94 | 94 | | as required by Section 50E.012(b), Agriculture Code, as added by |
---|
95 | 95 | | this Act. |
---|
96 | 96 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017. |
---|