Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1984 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/10/2017

                            85R139 AJZ-D
 By: Miles S.B. No. 1984


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation and funding of the urban farming pilot
 program and the creation of the Select Committee on Urban Farming.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Title 3, Agriculture Code, is amended by adding
 Chapter 50E to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 50E. URBAN FARMING PILOT PROGRAM AND SELECT COMMITTEE
 SUBCHAPTER A. URBAN FARMING PILOT PROGRAM
 Sec. 50E.001.  DEFINITION. In this chapter, "program" means
 the urban farming pilot program established under this chapter.
 Sec. 50E.002.  ESTABLISHMENT OF URBAN FARMING PILOT PROGRAM.
 (a) The department by rule shall develop and implement an urban
 farming pilot program through which the department will award
 grants if funding for grants is available to urban farmers in this
 state to establish new urban farms and expand existing urban farms.
 (b)  The department by rule shall define "urban farm" and
 "urban farmer" for purposes of this chapter.
 (c)  The department may operate the program in an area
 designated as an enterprise zone under Chapter 2303, Government
 Code, in a municipality with a population of 500,000 or more.
 Sec. 50E.003.  USE OF AWARDED GRANT MONEY. A grant recipient
 may use grant money awarded under the program only to cover costs
 that are approved by the department.
 Sec. 50E.004.  GRANT RECIPIENT REPORTING REQUIREMENTS. A
 grant recipient shall report information related to the program to
 the department in the form and manner and at regular intervals as
 prescribed by the department.
 Sec. 50E.005.  EVALUATION BY DEPARTMENT. The department
 shall monitor and periodically evaluate:
 (1)  the performance of each grant recipient under the
 program;
 (2)  how each grant recipient uses the grant money
 awarded under the program; and
 (3)  the effect of the program on the grant recipient
 and on the residents of the municipality in which the grant
 recipient uses grant money.
 Sec. 50E.006.  GRANTS AND DONATIONS. The department may
 seek, accept, and spend any funds received through grants or
 donations from public or private sources for the purposes of the
 program.
 SUBCHAPTER B. SELECT COMMITTEE ON URBAN FARMING
 Sec. 50E.011.  DEFINITION. In this chapter, "committee"
 means the Select Committee on Urban Farming.
 Sec. 50E.012.  COMPOSITION. (a) The Select Committee on
 Urban Farming is composed of:
 (1)  three members appointed by the president of
 Prairie View A&M University;
 (2)  three members appointed by the board of regents of
 The Texas A&M University System; and
 (3)  three members appointed by the director of the
 Texas A&M AgriLife Extension Service.
 (b)  The committee shall elect a presiding officer from among
 its members.
 Sec. 50E.013.  COMPENSATION. A person is not entitled to
 compensation or reimbursement for serving as a committee member.
 Sec. 50E.014.  COMMITTEE DUTIES. (a) The committee shall:
 (1)  meet at the call of the presiding officer; and
 (2)  conduct an interim study and make recommendations
 to the legislature regarding:
 (A)  the performance and operation of the program;
 (B)  the continuation, elimination, or expansion
 of the program;
 (C)  urban farming trends, including farming in
 sustainable living communities, cooperative crop production, and
 vertical integration farming;
 (D)  capacity for urban farming in this state; and
 (E)  potential effects of urban farming on the
 population of this state and on enterprise zones.
 (b)  The committee may request the assistance of state
 agencies, departments, or offices to carry out its duties.
 Sec. 50E.015.  REPORT. Not later than December 1, 2018, the
 committee shall submit a report based on its findings to:
 (1)  the governor;
 (2)  the lieutenant governor; and
 (3)  the speaker of the house of representatives.
 SUBCHAPTER C. EXPIRATION OF CHAPTER
 Sec. 50E.021.  EXPIRATION. This chapter expires and the
 committee is abolished September 1, 2019.
 SECTION 2.  (a) Not later than January 1, 2018, the
 Department of Agriculture shall implement the urban farming pilot
 program established under Chapter 50E, Agriculture Code, as added
 by this Act.
 (b)  Not later than October 1, 2017, the appointing entities
 listed in Section 50E.012, Agriculture Code, as added by this Act,
 shall make the appointments required by that section.
 (c)  Not later than October 15, 2017, the commissioner of
 agriculture shall call the first meeting of the Select Committee on
 Urban Farming to permit the committee to elect a presiding officer
 as required by Section 50E.012(b), Agriculture Code, as added by
 this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.