House
|
05/20/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4176
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Recommitted to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3800
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Postponed
|
5/18/17 5:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 3716
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 3716
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3716
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3606
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 1682
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1682
|
House
|
03/22/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 806
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 684
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 614
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 614
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 614
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 614
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 611
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA9 Seliger
|
Journal Page: 611
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
|
Journal Page: 611
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 591
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 586
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 586
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 582
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 628
|
Senate
|
03/20/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 572
|
Senate
|
03/16/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 548
|
Senate
|
03/14/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 340
|
Senate
|
01/24/2017
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 90
|
Senate
|
01/24/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 90
|
Senate
|
11/29/2016
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/29/2016
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|