Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill November 29, 2016

House Committee Report

Analysis February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Engrossed

Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill March 21, 2017

Senate Committee Report

Analysis February 2, 2025
Witness List February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill May 15, 2017
Bill March 16, 2017