Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2034 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/10/2017

                            85R14820 SLB-D
 By: Miles S.B. No. 2034


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to creation of a task force to study the health effects of
 concrete and rock crushing.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  TASK FORCE TO STUDY CONCRETE AND ROCK CRUSHING.
 (a)  In this Act, "task force" means the Task Force to Study the
 Health Effects of Concrete and Rock Crushing established under this
 section.
 (b)  The Task Force to Study the Health Effects of Concrete
 and Rock Crushing is established for the purpose of assessing the
 health effects of concrete and rock crushing.
 (c)  The task force is composed of members appointed by the
 governor to represent the following:
 (1)  the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality; and
 (2)  the Department of State Health Services.
 (d)  The task force may seek input from:
 (1)  the Texas Medical Association;
 (2)  the Texas Hospital Association;
 (3)  the American Heart Association; and
 (4)  the American Lung Association.
 (e)  The members of the task force shall elect a presiding
 officer from among the membership.
 (f)  The offices of the governor, lieutenant governor, and
 speaker of the house of representatives shall provide staff support
 to the task force.
 (g)  The task force shall hold public hearings to achieve the
 purpose described by Subsection (b) of this section.
 (h)  A member of the task force is not entitled to receive
 compensation for service on the task force but is entitled to
 reimbursement of the travel expenses incurred by the member while
 conducting the business of the task force.
 (i)  The task force may accept gifts and grants from any
 source to be used to carry out a function of the task force.
 SECTION 2.  FINAL REPORT. Not later than November 1, 2018,
 the task force shall submit a final report to the governor, the
 lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of representatives,
 and the appropriate standing committees of the legislature.  The
 report shall include a summary and analysis of:
 (1)  hearings and studies conducted by the task force;
 (2)  legislation proposed by the task force; and
 (3)  other findings and recommendations made by the
 task force.
 SECTION 3.  APPOINTMENTS. Not later than December 1, 2017,
 the governor shall make the appointments to the task force as
 described by Section 1(c) of this Act.
 SECTION 4.  EXPIRATION. The task force is abolished and this
 Act expires August 31, 2019.
 SECTION 5.  EFFECTIVE DATE.  This Act takes effect
 immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members
 elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas
 Constitution.  If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for
 immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2017.