House | 05/09/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 3149 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3149 | |
House | 05/02/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2295 | |
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1570 | |
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1525 | |
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1525 | |
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1525 | |
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1525 | |
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1525 | |
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1525 | |
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Amended | Journal Page: 1525 | |
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Amendment(s) offered | FA2 Uresti | Journal Page: 1524 |
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1524 | |
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1524 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1318 | |
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1260 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/31/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 151 | |
Senate | 01/25/2017 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 117 | |
Senate | 01/25/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 117 | |
Senate | 11/14/2016 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/14/2016 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |