Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB210 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Kolkhorst, Bettencourt S.B. No. 210
 (In the Senate - Filed November 14, 2016; January 25, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
 April 24, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 24, 2017,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 210 By:  Creighton


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the required repeal or amendment of two state agency
 rules before adoption of a new state agency rule that increases
 costs to regulated persons.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 2001, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 2001.0045 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2001.0045.  REQUIREMENT FOR RULE INCREASING COSTS TO
 REGULATED PERSONS. (a)  In this section, "state agency" has the
 meaning assigned by Section 2001.006.
 (b)  Except as provided by Subsection (c), a state agency may
 not adopt a proposed rule for which the fiscal note for the notice
 required by Section 2001.024 states that the rule imposes a cost on
 any regulated person, including another state agency, a special
 district, and a local government, unless on or before the effective
 date of the proposed rule the state agency:
 (1)  repeals two state agency rules that impose total
 costs on the person in an amount equal to or greater than the cost
 imposed on the person by the proposed rule;
 (2)  amends two state agency rules to decrease the
 total costs imposed on the person by an amount equal to or greater
 than the cost imposed on the person by the proposed rule; or
 (3)  repeals one state agency rule and amends one state
 agency rule to decrease the total costs imposed on the person by an
 amount equal to or less than the proposed rule.
 (c)  This section does not apply to a rule that:
 (1)  relates to state agency procurement; or
 (2)  is amended to:
 (A)  reduce the burden or responsibilities
 imposed on a regulated person by the rule; or
 (B)  decrease the person's cost for compliance
 with the rule.
 (d)  Each state agency that adopts a rule subject to this
 section shall comply with the requirements imposed by Subchapter B
 and Chapter 2002 for publication in the Texas Register.
 SECTION 2.  Section 2001.0045, Government Code, as added by
 this Act, applies only to a rule proposed by a state agency on or
 after the effective date of this Act.  A rule proposed before that
 date is governed by the law in effect on the date the rule was
 proposed, and the former law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect only if a specific
 appropriation for the implementation of the Act is provided in a
 general appropriations act of the 85th Legislature.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *