Senate | 05/15/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Referred to Transportation | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 03/10/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/10/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |