Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2105 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 10, 2017

Engrossed

Bill April 26, 2017

Enrolled

Bill May 8, 2017

Comm Sub

Bill May 4, 2017
Bill April 19, 2017