Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2252 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 27, 2017

Engrossed

Bill May 4, 2017

Enrolled

Bill May 25, 2017

Comm Sub

Bill May 11, 2017
Bill April 20, 2017