Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2256 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/02/2017

                            By: Kolkhorst S.B. No. 2256
 (In the Senate - Filed March 28, 2017; April 4, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; May 2, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 5, Nays 0, 1 present not voting; May 2, 2017, sent to
 printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the compensation of and reimbursement of expenses of
 the directors of the Aliana Management District.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 3865, Special District
 Local Laws Code, is amended by adding Section 3865.054 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 3865.054.  COMPENSATION; EXPENSES. (a)  The district
 may compensate each director in an amount not to exceed $150 for
 each board meeting. The total amount of compensation for each
 director in one year may not exceed $7,200.
 (b)  A director is entitled to reimbursement for necessary
 and reasonable expenses incurred in carrying out the duties and
 responsibilities of the board.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *