House | 05/18/2017 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 05/18/2017 | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. | ||
House | 05/18/2017 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/18/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/04/2017 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 2642 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2642 | |
House | 04/19/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1683 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1178 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1020 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1020 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1020 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1020 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1020 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1020 | |
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 932 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/30/2017 | Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs | Journal Page: 126 | |
Senate | 01/30/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 126 | |
Senate | 11/16/2016 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/16/2016 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |