Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2276 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill April 12, 2017

Engrossed

Bill May 20, 2017

Enrolled

Bill May 29, 2017

Comm Sub

Bill May 21, 2017
Bill May 12, 2017