Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2282 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/26/2017

                    By: Nichols S.B. No. 2282
 (In the Senate - Filed April 18, 2017; April 19, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; April 26, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0;
 April 26, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2282 By:  Bettencourt


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the dissolution of the Angelina County Water Control
 and Improvement District No. 3 and the territory of the Angelina
 County Fresh Water Supply District No. 1.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a)  Beginning on the effective date of this
 Act, the directors of the Angelina County Water Control and
 Improvement District No. 3 shall wind up the affairs of the
 district.
 (b)  On the 30th day after the effective date of this Act:
 (1)  the Angelina County Water Control and Improvement
 District No. 3 is dissolved;
 (2)  the terms of the directors of the district expire;
 and
 (3)  all assets and liabilities of the district are
 transferred to the Angelina County Fresh Water Supply District No.
 1.
 SECTION 2.  Subtitle B, Title 6, Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended by adding Chapter 6918 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 6918.  ANGELINA COUNTY FRESH WATER SUPPLY DISTRICT NO. 1;
 TERRITORY
 Sec. 6918.001.  DEFINITION. In this chapter, "district"
 means the Angelina County Fresh Water Supply District No. 1.
 Sec. 6918.002.  ADDITIONAL TERRITORY. On the effective date
 of the Act enacting this chapter, the territory of the former
 Angelina County Water Control and Improvement District No. 3, as
 that territory existed on April 1, 2017, is added to the territory
 of the district.
 SECTION 3.  Before the 30th day after the effective date of
 this Act, the board of directors of the Angelina County Water
 Control and Improvement District No. 3 may select from the members
 serving on the board on the date of the selection one member to
 serve as a nonvoting member of the board of the Angelina County
 Fresh Water Supply District No. 1 from the date of the selection
 until the next election of directors for the Angelina County Fresh
 Water Supply District No. 1.
 SECTION 4.  (a)  The legal notice of the intention to
 introduce this Act, setting forth the general substance of this
 Act, has been published as provided by law, and the notice and a
 copy of this Act have been furnished to all persons, agencies,
 officials, or entities to which they are required to be furnished
 under Section 59, Article XVI, Texas Constitution, and Chapter 313,
 Government Code.
 (b)  The governor, one of the required recipients, has
 submitted the notice and Act to the Texas Commission on
 Environmental Quality.
 (c)  The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality has filed
 its recommendations relating to this Act with the governor, the
 lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house of
 representatives within the required time.
 (d)  All requirements of the constitution and laws of this
 state and the rules and procedures of the legislature with respect
 to the notice, introduction, and passage of this Act are fulfilled
 and accomplished.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *