Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2282 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill April 19, 2017

Engrossed

Bill May 3, 2017

Enrolled

Bill May 22, 2017

Comm Sub

Bill May 16, 2017
Bill April 26, 2017