Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2285 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill April 21, 2017

Engrossed

Bill May 12, 2017

Enrolled

Bill May 25, 2017

Comm Sub

Bill May 18, 2017
Bill May 4, 2017