Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2286 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill April 24, 2017

Engrossed

Bill May 12, 2017

Enrolled

Bill May 22, 2017

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2017
Bill May 4, 2017