House | 05/25/2017 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Passed | ||
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Laid before the Senate | ||
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Referred to Transportation | ||
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Permission to introduce | ||
Senate | 05/05/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |