House | 05/09/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 3149 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3149 | |
House | 04/24/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1802 | |
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1287 | |
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1241 | |
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1241 | |
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1241 | |
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1240 | |
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1208 | |
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1208 | |
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1208 | |
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 985 | |
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 857 | |
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/30/2017 | Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security | Journal Page: 129 | |
Senate | 01/30/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 129 | |
Senate | 11/29/2016 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/29/2016 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |