E | 05/29/2017 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/29/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 4243 | |
E | 05/26/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3699 | |
House | 05/26/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5566 | |
Senate | 05/25/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3317 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3504 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2963 | |
House | 05/24/2017 | Record vote | RV#1740 | Journal Page: 4631 |
House | 05/24/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 4631 | |
House | 05/24/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4631 | |
House | 05/24/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4580 | |
House | 05/24/2017 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 4580 | |
House | 05/23/2017 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 4517 | |
House | 05/23/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4517 | |
House | 05/23/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/21/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/20/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/20/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/19/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4004 | |
House | 05/18/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/18/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/18/2017 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 05/12/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 3383 | |
House | 05/12/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3383 | |
House | 04/20/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1701 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1228 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1181 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1181 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1181 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1181 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1181 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1181 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1181 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 921 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/30/2017 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 129 | |
Senate | 01/30/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 129 | |
Senate | 11/29/2016 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/29/2016 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |