Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB261 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/05/2017

                    By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 261
 (In the Senate - Filed November 29, 2016; January 30, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
 April 5, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 5, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the bulk purchase of information technology commodity
 items by the Department of Information Resources.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2157.068, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (e-3) to read as follows:
 (e-3)  The procedural requirements of Subsection (e-1) and
 the limitation prescribed by Subsection (e-2) do not apply to a
 department contract for the bulk purchase of commodity items
 intended for use by more than one state agency.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *