E | 05/23/2017 | See remarks for effective date | ||
E | 05/23/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2881 | |
E | 05/15/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1952 | |
House | 05/15/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3486 | |
Senate | 05/15/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1946 | |
Senate | 05/12/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1952 | |
Senate | 05/12/2017 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1907 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3245 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Record vote | RV#1144 | Journal Page: 3245 |
House | 05/11/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 3245 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3245 | |
House | 05/10/2017 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3168 | |
House | 05/10/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3168 | |
House | 05/10/2017 | Laid out in lieu of companion | CSHB 852 | Journal Page: 3168 |
House | 05/09/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3238 | |
House | 05/08/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/08/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/04/2017 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 2642 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2642 | |
House | 04/26/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1974 | |
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1321 | |
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1267 | |
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1267 | |
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1267 | |
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1267 | |
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1267 | |
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1267 | |
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1267 | |
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1007 | |
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/13/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 269 | |
Senate | 01/30/2017 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 130 | |
Senate | 01/30/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 130 | |
Senate | 12/07/2016 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/07/2016 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |