E
|
06/08/2017
|
Effective on 9/1/17
|
|
|
E
|
06/08/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4244
|
E
|
05/30/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4243
|
House
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6059
|
Senate
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4242
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4243
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4142
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5703
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1962
|
Journal Page: 5702
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5702
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6034
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4127
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3690
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
House appoints conferees w/inst-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3570
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3570
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
House appoints conferees with instructions
|
|
Journal Page: 5504
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Motion prevails
|
|
Journal Page: 5504
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Motion to instruct conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5504
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5504
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1929
|
Journal Page: 5503
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5503
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5093
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5093
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5093
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3240
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3239
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3239
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 3239
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3239
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3237
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2624
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4417
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1640
|
Journal Page: 4416
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4416
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Amended
|
1-Hunter
|
Journal Page: 4415
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4415
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4322
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1593
|
Journal Page: 4321
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4321
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Amended
|
1-Price
|
Journal Page: 4321
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Point of order overruled
|
Rule 4, Section 32(c)(2)
|
Journal Page: 4320
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4320
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4176
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 2755
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2755
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1686
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1228
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1172
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1172
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1172
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1171
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1171
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1171
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1171
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA3 Lucio
|
Journal Page: 1170
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1169
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1169
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 787
|
Senate
|
03/27/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 629
|
Senate
|
03/15/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 546
|
Senate
|
03/14/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 526
|
Senate
|
03/13/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 486
|
Senate
|
03/08/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 437
|
Senate
|
01/30/2017
|
Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security
|
|
Journal Page: 130
|
Senate
|
01/30/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 130
|
Senate
|
12/08/2016
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/08/2016
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|