LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2017 - 85th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB277
Compare Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB277
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB277
Compare Versions
SB277 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB277 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB277 Enrolled May 29, 2017
SB277 Comm Sub May 20, 2017
SB277 Engrossed April 19, 2017
SB277 Comm Sub March 13, 2017
SB277 Introduced December 8, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SB277 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB277 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB277 Enrolled May 29, 2017
SB277 Comm Sub May 20, 2017
SB277 Engrossed April 19, 2017
SB277 Comm Sub March 13, 2017
SB277 Introduced December 8, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare