E | 05/26/2017 | Effective on 9/1/17 | ||
E | 05/26/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3699 | |
E | 05/18/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2113 | |
House | 05/18/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3742 | |
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2089 | |
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2113 | |
Senate | 05/17/2017 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2024 | |
House | 05/16/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3501 | |
House | 05/16/2017 | Record vote | RV#1270 | Journal Page: 3500 |
House | 05/16/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 3500 | |
House | 05/16/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3500 | |
House | 05/15/2017 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3470 | |
House | 05/15/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3470 | |
House | 05/15/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/10/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/08/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3155 | |
House | 05/08/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/08/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/04/2017 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 2642 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2642 | |
House | 03/23/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 836 | |
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 717 | |
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 646 | |
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 646 | |
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 646 | |
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 646 | |
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 646 | |
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 646 | |
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 646 | |
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/08/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 02/22/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 02/22/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 02/22/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 328 | |
Senate | 02/22/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 02/22/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/22/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/30/2017 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 131 | |
Senate | 01/30/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 131 | |
Senate | 12/09/2016 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/09/2016 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |