E
|
06/09/2017
|
Effective on 9/1/17
|
|
|
E
|
06/09/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4244
|
E
|
05/28/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4213
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6032
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3794
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5566
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3699
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3379
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3379
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3379
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3375
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2624
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4372
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1601
|
Journal Page: 4372
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4372
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Amended
|
1-Price
|
Journal Page: 4370
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4370
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4211
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4211
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Amended
|
1-Price
|
Journal Page: 4210
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4210
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4175
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2884
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 2755
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2755
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1767
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1261
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Remarks ordered printed
|
|
Journal Page: 1205
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1205
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1205
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1205
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1205
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1204
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1204
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1204
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Huffman
|
Journal Page: 1204
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1204
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1204
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1226
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1142
|
Senate
|
04/12/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 983
|
Senate
|
04/10/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 958
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 857
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 831
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 465
|
Senate
|
02/21/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 308
|
Senate
|
01/30/2017
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 132
|
Senate
|
01/30/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 132
|
Senate
|
01/18/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 42
|
Senate
|
12/13/2016
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/13/2016
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|