LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2017 - 85th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB292
Compare Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB292
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB292
Compare Versions
SB292 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB292 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB292 Enrolled May 26, 2017
SB292 Comm Sub May 20, 2017
SB292 Engrossed April 20, 2017
SB292 Comm Sub April 10, 2017
SB292 Introduced December 13, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SB292 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB292 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB292 Enrolled May 26, 2017
SB292 Comm Sub May 20, 2017
SB292 Engrossed April 20, 2017
SB292 Comm Sub April 10, 2017
SB292 Introduced December 13, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare