House | 05/10/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/10/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/08/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/08/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/05/2017 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 2755 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2755 | |
House | 04/11/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1446 | |
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 985 | |
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 952 | |
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 952 | |
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 952 | |
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 952 | |
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 952 | |
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 952 | |
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 952 | |
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 956 | |
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 833 | |
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/30/2017 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 132 | |
Senate | 01/30/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 132 | |
Senate | 12/14/2016 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/14/2016 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |